MN HF2653 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Wills.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Wills.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human herpesvirus cytomegalovirus information made available.
Title
Human herpesvirus cytomegalovirus information made available.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Wills. |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Freiberg. |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2383 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy