MN HF2647 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 280 05/04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 280 05/04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public data definition relating to agreements involving payment of public money clarified.
Title
Public data definition relating to agreements involving payment of public money clarified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Secretary of State Chapter 280 05/04/12 | |
2012-05-04 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-01 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 130-0 |
2012-04-30 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-04-30 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-04-30 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-04-30 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-30 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-04-28 | Senate | Taken from table |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Laid on table |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2409 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-04-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 131-0 |
2012-04-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-16 | House | Amended |
2012-04-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-19 | House | Author added Schomacker |
2012-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-19 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-08 | House | Author added Dittrich |
2012-03-07 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law |
2012-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |