MN HF2617 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State government technical changes made; sections renumbered; antiquated, unnecessary, and obsolete language eliminated or modernized; and existing provisions updated.
Title
State government technical changes made; sections renumbered; antiquated, unnecessary, and obsolete language eliminated or modernized; and existing provisions updated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-25 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2312 |
2014-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |