MN HF26 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Sandstede
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School-linked mental health service grant funding increased, full-service community school funding provided, support our students grant funding extended, homework starts with home program funding provided, collaborative urban educator program funding increased, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School-linked mental health service grant funding increased, full-service community school funding provided, support our students grant funding extended, homework starts with home program funding provided, collaborative urban educator program funding increased, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Sandstede
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-01-31HouseAuthors added Bernardy, Bierman
2019-01-24HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-01-22HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-01-17HouseAuthor added Pinto
2019-01-14HouseAuthors added Mariani and Dehn
2019-01-10HouseReferred by Chair to Education Finance Division
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF369 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback