MN HF26 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-05 - House: Author added Lanning
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-05 - House: Author added Lanning
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fish spearing from a dark house allowed for nonresidents.
Title
Fish spearing from a dark house allowed for nonresidents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-05 | House: Author added Lanning | |
2009-01-16 | House: Referred by Chair to Game, Fish and Forestry Division | |
2009-01-15 | House: Author added Solberg | |
2009-01-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0026&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0026.0.pdf |