MN HF259 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cost-share requirement for schools that receive a tractor rollover protection grant eliminated, and retroactive effective date provided.
Title
Cost-share requirement for schools that receive a tractor rollover protection grant eliminated, and retroactive effective date provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Bennett. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF357 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance