MN HF255 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

K-12 education expense credit modified, credit amount and income phaseout increased, and credit phaseout threshold adjusted for inflation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 education expense credit modified, credit amount and income phaseout increased, and credit phaseout threshold adjusted for inflation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseAuthor added Dettmer.
2017-02-15HouseAuthor added Pugh.
2017-02-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2017-02-01HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
2017-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF416 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback