MN HF2490 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 294
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 294
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus capital investment bill.
Title
Omnibus capital investment bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 92 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 294 | |
2014-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 47-17 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Laid on table |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 92-40 |
2014-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-05-15 | House | Amended |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion for reconsideration |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion for reconsideration |
2014-05-15 | House | Amended |
2014-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2014-05-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2014-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2014-04-04 | House | Author added Ward, J.E. |
2014-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |