MN HF2480 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income and corporate franchise taxation foreign source income preferences eliminated, foreign royalties subtraction repealed, domestic corporations definition expanded; JOBZ tax benefits and apportionment of income modified; corporate franchise tax rates reduced; foreign operating corporations and mail order businesses special apportionment formula repealed; and school aid payment and property tax recognition shifts repaid.
Title
Income and corporate franchise taxation foreign source income preferences eliminated, foreign royalties subtraction repealed, domestic corporations definition expanded; JOBZ tax benefits and apportionment of income modified; corporate franchise tax rates reduced; foreign operating corporations and mail order businesses special apportionment formula repealed; and school aid payment and property tax recognition shifts repaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2012-03-22 | House | Author added Falk |
2012-03-07 | House | Authors added Ward and Hausman |
2012-02-29 | House | Author added Slocum |
2012-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2480&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2480&version=0&session=ls87 |