MN HF246 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Johnson, C.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Johnson, C.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Districting principles for legislative and congressional plans established, and commission appointed to recommend district boundaries.
Title
Districting principles for legislative and congressional plans established, and commission appointed to recommend district boundaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2017-03-14 | House | Author added Considine. |
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Metsa. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Olson. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Omar. |
2017-02-13 | House | Authors added Thissen, Maye Quade, and Moran. |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-01-19 | House | Authors added Lee and Slocum. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF370 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Author added Marty