MN HF2455 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate conferees DeKruif; Daley; Reinert
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate conferees DeKruif; Daley; Reinert
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Montgomery authorized to convey property for less than market value.
Title
Montgomery authorized to convey property for less than market value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate conferees DeKruif; Daley; Reinert |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House conferees Gruenhagen; Sanders; Winkler |
2012-03-29 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate conferees DeKruif, Daley, Reinert |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2012-03-28 | House | House conferees Gruenhagen, Sanders, Winkler |
2012-03-28 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1544 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2012-03-08 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |