MN HF245 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Authors added Fischer and Bernardy.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Automatic voter registration for driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card applicants provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic voter registration for driver's license, instruction permit, or identification card applicants provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseAuthors added Fischer and Bernardy.
2017-03-01HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein.
2017-02-16HouseAuthor added Liebling.
2017-01-19HouseAuthors added Lien; Lee; Maye Quade; Dehn, R.; Youakim; and Allen.
2017-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF323 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback