MN HF244 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Radon testing required by school districts.
Title
Radon testing required by school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Vang and Loeffler |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF201 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Author added Housley