MN HF2433 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety entities required to prioritize public safety and human rights.
Title
Public safety entities required to prioritize public safety and human rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-05-06 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |