MN HF2413 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Debtors with coerced debt provided remedies.
Title
Debtors with coerced debt provided remedies.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Norris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2712 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Author added Westlin