MN HF2412 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan sewer system inflow and infiltration funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Metropolitan sewer system inflow and infiltration funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Katherine Knuth [D] | Rep. Ann Lenczewski [D] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Michael Obermueller [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Author added Masin | |
2010-02-12 | House: Authors added Simon and Obermueller | |
2010-02-11 | House: Author added Lenczewski | |
2010-02-08 | House: Author added Knuth | |
2010-02-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-02-04 | House: Referred by Chair to Cultural and Outdoor Resources Finance Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2412&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2412.0.pdf |