MN HF241 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Author added Atkins.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic impersonation crime created, and penalties imposed.
Title
Electronic impersonation crime created, and penalties imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-01-26 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF419 (Similar To) 2015-02-02 - Author added Dziedzic