MN HF238 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Author added Poston.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in self-defense outside of home eliminated, boundaries of dwelling for purposes of self-defense expanded, presumption in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force created, and right to defend against entry extended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in self-defense outside of home eliminated, boundaries of dwelling for purposes of self-defense expanded, presumption in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force created, and right to defend against entry extended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-20HouseAuthor added Poston.
2017-05-15HouseSecond reading
2017-05-15HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2017-04-24HouseAuthor added Backer.
2017-03-29HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-01-23HouseAuthor added Grossell.
2017-01-19HouseAuthors added Bahr, C.; Miller; Franson; Dettmer; Daniels; and Loonan.
2017-01-17HouseAuthors added Scott, Pugh, Gruenhagen, and Erickson.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF292 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - Author added Mathews

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback