MN HF2344 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Orthotics, prosthetics, and pedorthics regulated; licensure required; and fees established.
Title
Orthotics, prosthetics, and pedorthics regulated; licensure required; and fees established.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2016-03-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2016-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2016-03-08 | House | Author added Albright. |
2015-05-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1368 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance