MN HF2331 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Author added Bly.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Teachers of Color Act funding provided, doubling the number of teachers of color and teachers who are American Indian sought, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Increase Teachers of Color Act funding provided, doubling the number of teachers of color and teachers who are American Indian sought, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-03-14 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2182 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Author added Wiger