MN HF2313 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Border-to-border broadband grant program modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Border-to-border broadband grant program modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Franson |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2169 (Similar To) 2023-02-27 - Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development