MN HF2302 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health professional education loan forgiveness program modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Health professional education loan forgiveness program modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author added Backer |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2386 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Health and Human Services