MN HF2301 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota public school literacy gap closure grant program created, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota public school literacy gap closure grant program created, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Morrison |
2021-03-23 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-22 | House | Authors added Jurgens and Bennett |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1983 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Dibble