MN HF2293 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School districts; ability to use prone restraints extended to one additional year, and data collection and reporting required.
Title
School districts; ability to use prone restraints extended to one additional year, and data collection and reporting required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-03-19 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-15 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1917 |
2012-03-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-12 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Reform |