MN HF2212 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added West.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added West.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Landfill cleanup program modified.
Title
Landfill cleanup program modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Author added West. |
2017-03-13 | House | Authors added Rosenthal and Christensen. |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2032 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Author added Hall