MN HF2209 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus environment and natural resources finance bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus environment and natural resources finance bill.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2019-04-25HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2314
2019-04-12HouseSecond reading
2019-04-12HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-04-10HouseAuthors added Wagenius, Considine, Lee, Persell, and Vang
2019-04-04HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2314 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - House conferees Hansen; Persell; Fischer; Becker-Finn; Nelson, N.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback