MN HF219 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Basic sliding fee child care programs modified, eligibility for early learning scholarship modified, system redesign provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Basic sliding fee child care programs modified, eligibility for early learning scholarship modified, system redesign provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein. |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Innovation Policy |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-01-23 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-01-17 | House | Authors added Clark, Pinto, and Hortman. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF317 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy