MN HF2183 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Thief River Falls; sales tax exemption for tax paid during construction of an eligible wholesale electronic component distribution center provided, forgiveable loan provided, business development public infrastructure program grant provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Thief River Falls; sales tax exemption for tax paid during construction of an eligible wholesale electronic component distribution center provided, forgiveable loan provided, business development public infrastructure program grant provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-15 | House | Author stricken Davids. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1884 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Authors added Chamberlain; Tomassoni