MN HF2160 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Masin.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Authors added Masin.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use of snares to take wild animals prohibited.
Title
Use of snares to take wild animals prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Masin. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Omar. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Clark and Mariani. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1447 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Author added Abeler