MN HF216 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agritourism activities liability immunity provided.
Title
Agritourism activities liability immunity provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] |
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-03-25 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF152 |
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF152 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Second reading