MN HF2157 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Division action, to pass and return to State Government Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Division action, to pass and return to State Government Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bemidji; veterans facility establishment funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Bemidji; veterans facility establishment funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House | Division action, to pass and return to State Government Finance |
2012-03-02 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans Services Division |
2012-02-13 | House | Author added Hancock |
2012-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2157&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2157&version=0&session=ls87 |