MN HF2136 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 267 05/02/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 267 05/02/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle damage disclosure modified.
Title
Motor vehicle damage disclosure modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Sanders [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Michael Beard [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Secretary of State Chapter 267 05/02/12 | |
2012-05-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-28 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-27 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 127-0 |
2012-04-27 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-04-27 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-04-27 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-04-27 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-04-27 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1734 |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-04-20 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2012-04-20 | House | Third reading |
2012-04-19 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Friday, April 20, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-19 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-19 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-03-05 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2012-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance |