MN HF2110 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Author added FitzSimmons
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Author added FitzSimmons
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sustainable agriculture programs and grants modified.
Title
Sustainable agriculture programs and grants modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Joe Mullery [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. David FitzSimmons [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Author added FitzSimmons |
2014-03-10 | House | Author added Bly |
2014-03-03 | House | Author added Mullery |
2014-02-27 | House | Authors added Isaacson and Johnson, S. |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |