MN HF21 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Student loan ombudsperson established, student loan servicer licensure required, and student loan servicing practices prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student loan ombudsperson established, student loan servicer licensure required, and student loan servicing practices prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseAuthor added Lee
2017-05-21HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2017-02-09HouseAuthor added Schultz.
2017-02-02HouseAuthor added Bly.
2017-01-09HouseAuthors added Dehn, R., and Loeffler.
2017-01-05HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF2955 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback