MN HF2096 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PFAS prohibited in ski wax.
Title
PFAS prohibited in ski wax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-02-28 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF669 (Similar To) 2023-01-25 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy