MN HF2077 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Authors added Koznick and Mariani.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Authors added Koznick and Mariani.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Teachers of Color Act funding provided, doubling the number of teachers of color and teachers who are American Indian sought, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Increase Teachers of Color Act funding provided, doubling the number of teachers of color and teachers who are American Indian sought, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Authors added Koznick and Mariani. |
2017-03-16 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-03-13 | House | Authors added Smith, Kresha, and Poston. |
2017-03-09 | House | Authors added Moran, Hamilton, and Theis. |
2017-03-08 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Davnie. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1555 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Authors added Wiger; Torres Ray; Abeler