MN HF2077 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School building bond agricultural credit provided, and money appropriated.
Title
School building bond agricultural credit provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Author added Erickson. |
2015-04-13 | House | Authors added Gruenhagen, Dettmer, and Bennett. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2004 (Similar To) 2015-04-16 - Author added Gazelka