MN HF207 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lawns to legumes grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Lawns to legumes grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - House: Bennett - Amendment - H0005A14 (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Kresha motion - Lay on the Table (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Kresha motion - Lay on the Table (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2023-02-09 | House | Third reading |
2023-02-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 9, 2023 |
2023-01-25 | House | Second reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Kozlowski |
2023-01-17 | House | Author added Moller |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-01-11 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Her, and Howard |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF170 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Author added Boldon