MN HF2040 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cities required to reserve a portion of local government aid for public safety purposes.
Title
Cities required to reserve a portion of local government aid for public safety purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF243 (Similar To) 2021-01-25 - Author added Draheim