MN HF202 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Decommissioned military vehicle registration and use authorized.
Title
Decommissioned military vehicle registration and use authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF179 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Second reading