MN HF201 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion funding limited for state-sponsored health programs.
Title
Abortion funding limited for state-sponsored health programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 84 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 80 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - Passage (Y: 80 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 56 | |
2011-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third reading vote: 40-26 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2011-05-20 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 40-26 |
2011-05-19 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 84-48 |
2011-05-19 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2011-05-19 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2011-05-19 | House | Conference committee report |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate conferees Thompson; Hall; Stumpf |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-17 | Senate | House conferees Scott; Bills; Fritz |
2011-05-17 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate conferees Thompson, Hall, and Stumpf |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-16 | House | House conferees Scott, Bills, Fritz |
2011-05-16 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 40-26 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF103 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-05-06 | House | Bill was passed vote: 80-44 |
2011-05-06 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-03-16 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Policy and Finance |
2011-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |