MN HF2007 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidating counties and rationalizing other internal boundaries feasibility study required, and money appropriated.
Title
Consolidating counties and rationalizing other internal boundaries feasibility study required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Mindy Greiling [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Rep. Michael Paymar [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2012-02-13 | House | Author added Simon |
2012-02-01 | House | Author added Paymar |
2012-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |