MN HF2002 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Vang
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Summer education program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Summer education program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1660 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy