MN HF2000 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Contract and certificate of compliance requirements changed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract and certificate of compliance requirements changed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor

Same As/Similar To

SF2280 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback