MN HF200 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural land study on valuation based on production value provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Agricultural land study on valuation based on production value provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-01-17 | House | Author added Poppe. |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF111 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes