MN HF2 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Carlson
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Author added Carlson
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State government worker protection provisions adopted, workers' compensation coverage presumption provided, social security and social security disability offsets removed for unemployment insurance, laid-off worker rehire and retention protections provided, emergency paid sick leave for essential workers provided, requiring reports, and rulemaking authorized.
Title
State government worker protection provisions adopted, workers' compensation coverage presumption provided, social security and social security disability offsets removed for unemployment insurance, laid-off worker rehire and retention protections provided, emergency paid sick leave for essential workers provided, requiring reports, and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Carlson |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Bernardy and Wazlawik |
2021-01-21 | House | Authors added Hassan and Jordan |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-01-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-01-11 | House | Authors added Noor, Youakim, Koegel |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF719 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Author added McEwen