MN HF2 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Performance data added to budget proposal, zero-based budgeting required, and sunset advisory commission and sunset process established for state agencies.
Title
Performance data added to budget proposal, zero-based budgeting required, and sunset advisory commission and sunset process established for state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 3 | |
2011-07-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2011-07-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-27 |
2011-07-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-07-19 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2011-07-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-07-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-04-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2011-02-09 | House | Author added Bills |
2011-01-31 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2011-01-18 | House | Author added Shimanski |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Crawford, Murray, Lohmer, Erickson, Fabian, McDonald, Myhra, Sanders, Dittrich, Kieffer, Holberg, Hancock, Murdock, Barrett, Torkelson and Downey |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |