MN HF1994 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public waters and drainage ditch buffer requirements modified, and rulemaking for soil loss ordinances clarified.
Title
Public waters and drainage ditch buffer requirements modified, and rulemaking for soil loss ordinances clarified.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Agriculture Policy |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1693 (Similar To) 2017-03-09 - Second reading