MN HF1984 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Author added Clark.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Author added Clark.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Sports Facilities Authority required to make stadium bird safe.
Title
Minnesota Sports Facilities Authority required to make stadium bird safe.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Author added Clark. |
2015-03-19 | House | Author added Freiberg. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2014 (Similar To) 2015-04-07 - Referred to State and Local Government