MN HF1984 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public construction accountability and transparency enhanced, and responsible contractor definition and requirement established.
Title
Public construction accountability and transparency enhanced, and responsible contractor definition and requirement established.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] |
Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Patti Fritz [D] | Rep. Dennis McNamara [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Joe Mullery [D] | Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 84 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 88 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 88 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 253 | |
2014-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-13 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-13 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 59-0 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third reading vote: 59-0 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-12 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 84-38 |
2014-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate conferees Saxhaug, Hayden, Housley |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate conferees Saxhaug; Hayden; Housley |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House conferees Sundin; Mullery; Zerwas |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-06 | House | House conferees Sundin, Mullery, Zerwas |
2014-05-05 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-05-05 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 53-4 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1919 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1919, now on General Orders |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-30 | House | Author added Mullery |
2014-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 88-39 |
2014-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-29 | House | Amended |
2014-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion to re-refer Transportation Finance |
2014-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy |
2014-03-10 | House | Authors added Metsa, Anzelc, Schoen, Fritz, McNamara, and Mahoney |
2014-03-06 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2014-03-03 | House | Author added Winkler |
2014-02-27 | House | Authors added Freiberg, Garofalo, and Zerwas |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |